California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1079 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Amended

Bill July 10, 2013
Bill June 26, 2013
Bill May 8, 2013
Bill April 2, 2013