Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2013
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 16. Page 1603.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/07/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|