|
09/28/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 410, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 2785.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 1980.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (August 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 21. Page 1596.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|