Senate | 06/09/2014 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 06/19/2013 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2013 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2013 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1478.) | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2013 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 8). | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2013 | Referred to Com. on G.O. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2013 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2013 | Introduced. To print. |