|
10/08/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 651, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 20. Page 2928.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 6 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 2108.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 17. Page 1327.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|