Assembly | 02/03/2014 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2014 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2013 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2013 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2013 | Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2013 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2013 | Introduced. To print. |