|
03/28/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 8, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2014
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4144.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2014
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (March 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2014
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/06/2014
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4028.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after March 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 2858.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (February 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (February 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2014
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1816.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/07/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|