|
03/06/2014
|
Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2014
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2013
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 2929.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 6 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2110.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 1701.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2013
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/07/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|