California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1130 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 15, 2014

Amended

Bill June 30, 2014
Bill April 18, 2013
Bill March 21, 2013