California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1131 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2013

Amended

Bill September 4, 2013
Bill September 3, 2013
Bill June 24, 2013
Bill April 22, 2013