Assembly | 02/03/2014 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2014 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2013 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 9. Noes 6.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2013 | Referred to Coms. on W.,P. & W. and G.O. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2013 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2013 | Introduced. To print. |