Senate
|
09/12/2013
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2400.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
From committee: Return to Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 10). Ordered to third reading. Measure version as amended on September 6 corrected.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2013
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2013
|
Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2013
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 22. Page 1319.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|