|
10/08/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 631, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3326.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2403.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1661.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 14.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|