Assembly
|
02/03/2014
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2014
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2014
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 14.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|