California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1234 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 19, 2014

Amended

Bill July 1, 2014
Bill January 17, 2014
Bill January 6, 2014