|
08/16/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 114, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:40 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 1700.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and INS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1223.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on B.,P. & C.P. and INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|