Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Roth.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2013
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Padilla.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
From special consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2013
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 1706.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) . Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|