California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1285 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Amended

Bill June 25, 2014
Bill June 11, 2014
Bill May 24, 2013
Bill April 2, 2013