California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1287 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2013

Amended

Bill July 9, 2013
Bill June 19, 2013
Bill April 2, 2013
Bill March 21, 2013