|
03/06/2014
|
Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2014
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2013
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/23/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 3083.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 2253.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 1707.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) . Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|