California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1295 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Amended

Bill June 25, 2013
Bill May 29, 2013
Bill May 24, 2013
Bill April 23, 2013
Bill April 9, 2013
Bill March 21, 2013