|
10/03/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 507, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/03/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 18. Page 3304.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 2356.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2013
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 1707.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) . Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2013
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|