|
03/28/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 7, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2014
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4098.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2014
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (March 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/06/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after March 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2874.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2014
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2013
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hill.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1344.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|