California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1309 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2013

Amended

Bill September 5, 2013
Bill September 4, 2013
Bill August 28, 2013
Bill August 13, 2013
Bill April 25, 2013
Bill April 10, 2013