California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1310 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Amended

Bill August 22, 2014
Bill July 1, 2014
Bill June 10, 2014
Bill May 24, 2013