|
08/13/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 106, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2013
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1607.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1344.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|