LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1318
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1318
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1318
Compare Versions
AB1318 Amended June 26, 2014
AB1318 Amended May 29, 2014
AB1318 Amended May 24, 2013
AB1318 Amended April 22, 2013
AB1318 Amended April 2, 2013
AB1318 Amended March 21, 2013
AB1318 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB1318 Amended June 26, 2014
AB1318 Amended May 29, 2014
AB1318 Amended May 24, 2013
AB1318 Amended April 22, 2013
AB1318 Amended April 2, 2013
AB1318 Amended March 21, 2013
AB1318 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare