Assembly | 02/03/2014 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2014 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 01/06/2014 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2013 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2013 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2013 | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2013 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2013 | Introduced. To print. |