Assembly | 05/30/2013 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 24. Noes 37. Page 1849.). | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2013 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2013 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2013 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2013 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (April 29). | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2013 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2013 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2013 | Introduced. To print. |