|
09/09/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 273, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2787.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1981.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1470.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2013
|
Referred to Com. on G.O. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|