Senate
|
07/03/2013
|
In committee: Held without recommendation.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 29. Page 1718.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 46. Noes 23. Page 1526.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|