Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Emmerson.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on G.O. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (September 10). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2013
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Galgiani.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2013
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1826.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|