California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB137 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 6, 2013

Amended

Bill June 19, 2013
Bill May 6, 2013
Bill April 10, 2013
Bill March 14, 2013