California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1371 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2013

Amended

Bill August 20, 2013
Bill June 26, 2013
Bill April 24, 2013
Bill April 8, 2013
Bill March 21, 2013