|
03/06/2014
|
Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2014
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2013
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/23/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 11. Page 3084.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2251.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 12. Page 1220.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|