California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1376 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 19, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 13, 2013

Amended

Bill September 6, 2013
Bill April 30, 2013
Bill April 18, 2013