|
10/04/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 558, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2935.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 6 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2105.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2013
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1120.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|