10/05/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 599, Statutes of 2013. | |||
10/05/2013 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 09/09/2013 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 09/03/2013 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/03/2013 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2091.). | ||
Senate | 06/06/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/05/2013 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 5). | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2013 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 884.) | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2013 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 2). | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2013 | Read first time. To print. |