Senate | 09/06/2013 | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 08/19/2013 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Monning. | ||
Senate | 07/01/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/27/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (June 26). | ||
Senate | 06/10/2013 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2013 | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2013 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 20. Page 1471.) | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 8). | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2013 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 4. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2013 | Read first time. To print. |