|
10/11/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 751, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 2180.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 1711.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) . Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 4.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|