California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1391 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 4, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 28, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2013

Amended

Bill August 19, 2013
Bill June 27, 2013
Bill June 17, 2013
Bill April 11, 2013
Bill April 3, 2013