Senate | 06/27/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 06/19/2013 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2013 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2013 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1579.) | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2013 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 15). | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2013 | Referred to Com. on B. & F. | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 6. | ||
Assembly | 03/06/2013 | Read first time. To print. |