|
10/03/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 509, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/03/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/23/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3123.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2262.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2013
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hill.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1579.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2013
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 11.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|