|
09/06/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 223, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2013
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 1881.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 18. Page 1657.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/04/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. Introduced measure version corrected.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/03/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|