California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1403 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 3, 2013

Amended

Bill July 8, 2013
Bill June 13, 2013