Assembly | 02/03/2014 | Died on inactive file. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2013 | From consent calendar. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Bradford. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2013 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 6). | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2013 | Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 13. | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2013 | Read first time. To print. |