Senate
|
08/29/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 4976.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2013
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wright.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1602.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2013
|
Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|