Senate | 08/15/2013 | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wright. | ||
Senate | 08/13/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/12/2013 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2013 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2013 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2013 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 1602.) | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 15). | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2013 | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 20. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2013 | Read first time. To print. |