California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1420 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 21, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2013

Amended

Bill July 11, 2013
Bill June 6, 2013