|
09/09/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 276, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 2664.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1883.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1579.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2013
|
Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|